+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee Taxation
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 04/22/2021
- Tabled in Committee Taxation
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Taxation
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Back for Requester Changes
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 31, 2021 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 27, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor