+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Failed
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Introduced
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 3, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor