+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (43)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
- Signed by Speaker
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety on 04/28/2021
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Public Health, Welfare and Safety
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Public Health, Welfare and Safety
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety
- First Reading
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Human Services
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Human Services
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Human Services on 04/13/2021
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Human Services
- Introduced
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor