+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
- Tabled in Committee
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 17, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (3)
April 13, 2011: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 45
April 12, 2011: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 44
April 8, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Gordon R Hendrick
Type:
Primary Sponsor