+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
- Tabled in Committee
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor