+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (47)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred State Administration
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred State Administration
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 04/03/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- First Reading
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended State Administration
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended State Administration
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 02/22/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Kimberly Dudik
Type:
Primary Sponsor