+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Motion Failed
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Sponsor List Modified
- Hearing
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 29, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Vote
February 22, 2011: Take HJ 10 from Comm-Reinhart
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 63
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor