+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (49)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House with Amendments
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 25, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Executive Director Final Review
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Edit
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 12, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 21, 2017 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor