+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Signed by Speaker
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety on 04/24/2019
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Public Health, Welfare and Safety
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Public Health, Welfare and Safety
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety
- First Reading
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Human Services
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Human Services
- Hearing scheduled in committee Human Services on 04/11/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Human Services
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Dennis R Lenz
Type:
Primary Sponsor