+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (45)
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Printed - New Version Available
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 16, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
On December 12, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 11, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
- Draft On Hold
On November 25, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor