+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee Judiciary
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Judiciary
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 04/09/2019
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- Introduced
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Back for Redo
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Kimberly Dudik
Type:
Primary Sponsor