+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (45)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation on 04/16/2019
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
- First Reading
On April 13, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Agriculture
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Agriculture
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Agriculture on 03/26/2019
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee Agriculture
- Introduced
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Theresa Manzella
Type:
Primary Sponsor