+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee State Administration
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 02/26/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- Introduced
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 16, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Edit
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Tom Woods
Type:
Primary Sponsor