+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee
- Hearing
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On March 21, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Back for Requester Changes
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Taken by Drafter
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 13
April 16, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 1
April 1, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor