+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee Taxation
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee Taxation
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Taxation
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Taxation
- Scheduled for Executive Action
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 23, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Estimating Resolution Transmittal
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 03/21/2019
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Taxation on 03/14/2019
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Taxation
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 26, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 23, 2018 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On November 21, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 14, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Alan Redfield
Type:
Primary Sponsor