+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (49)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House with Amendments
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Energy and Telecommunications
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Energy and Telecommunications
- Hearing scheduled in committee Energy and Telecommunications on 04/13/2021
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Energy and Telecommunications on 04/01/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Energy and Telecommunications
- First Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
On February 27, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
- Hearing scheduled in committee Energy, Technology and Federal Relations on 02/26/2021
- Amendments Available
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor