+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 16, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 13
March 13, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 13
February 19, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor