+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Passed
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 2, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 2, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 30, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 23, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On November 22, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On November 18, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On November 6, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor