+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 22, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 14, 2010 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On November 8, 2010 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On September 16, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On September 15, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On September 14, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On August 27, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On August 25, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On July 30, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 8, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 12
January 22, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
January 21, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 19, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor