+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (96)
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to House Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments
- 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments
- Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments
- 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Finance and Claims
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Finance and Claims
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 04/15/2021
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Rereferred to Committee Finance and Claims
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Judiciary
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Judiciary
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 03/23/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 27, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Appropriations
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Appropriations
- Taken from Table in Committee Appropriations
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Appropriations
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 01/26/2021
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Appropriations on 01/22/2021
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 10, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 01/06/2021
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 29, 2020 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On December 22, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 21, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On December 11, 2020 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 10, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor