+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (63)
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Rereferred to Committee
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 6, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 2, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 3, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
On December 2, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 28, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On November 22, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On November 19, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 16, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 13, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor