+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (47)
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Energy and Telecommunications
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Energy and Telecommunications
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Energy and Telecommunications on 02/09/2021
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Energy and Telecommunications on 01/26/2021
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Energy and Telecommunications
- First Reading
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
- Hearing scheduled in committee Energy, Technology and Federal Relations on 01/13/2021
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 29, 2020 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On December 10, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On December 9, 2020 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 8, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft On Hold
On November 30, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Canceled
On November 25, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On November 23, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On September 15, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor