+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 26, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Sponsor List Modified
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
- Sponsor List Modified
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 4, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 15, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 13, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 24, 2010 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 23, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 16, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On November 10, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 4, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 14, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 8, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 7
April 7, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 6
March 26, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
March 25, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 11
February 15, 2011: AMD- 1 Kennedy D/PASS
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 69
February 15, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 15
February 9, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor