+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Transportation
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Transportation on 01/21/2019
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On January 6, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 17, 2018 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Transportation
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On July 31, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Willis Curdy
Type:
Primary Sponsor