+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (59)
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- 2nd Reading Passed
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Scheduled for Executive Action
- Printed - New Version Available
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 6, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 15, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 13, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 3, 2010 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 2, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On December 1, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 30, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On November 23, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 17, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 11, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 5, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On October 5, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On August 24, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (7)
March 22, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 13
March 17, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 11
February 1, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 13
January 31, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 16
January 31, 2011: AMD- 1 Reinhart D/PASS
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 62
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor