+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (41)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Process
- 3rd Reading Failed
- Motion Failed
- Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process
- 3rd Reading Failed
- Motion Failed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Motion Failed
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Motion Carried
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Motion Failed
- 3rd Reading Failed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
- Scheduled for Executive Action
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 2, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 30, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On November 22, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On November 21, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 17, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On August 30, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor