+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
- Fiscal Note Received
- Fiscal Note Printed
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Taxation
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 03/27/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Taxation
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 23, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Shane A Morigeau
Type:
Primary Sponsor