+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (52)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Process
On April 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed
- 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Finance and Claims
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Finance and Claims
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 04/08/2019
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Finance and Claims
- First Reading
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Appropriations
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 03/27/2019
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Appropriations
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Appropriations
- First Reading
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On March 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Legal Review
- Executive Director Review
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Matt Regier
Type:
Primary Sponsor