+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (50)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 04/09/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- First Reading
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Business and Labor
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Business and Labor
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 03/27/2019
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On March 23, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On July 29, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Derek J Harvey
Type:
Primary Sponsor