+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (50)
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 04/12/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- First Reading
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Business and Labor
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Business and Labor
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 03/26/2019
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 03/25/2019
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Executive Director Final Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Mark Noland
Type:
Primary Sponsor