+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Taxation
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 03/28/2019
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Taxation
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On March 17, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Jim Hamilton
Type:
Primary Sponsor