+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Federal Relations, Energy and Telecommunications
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Hearing scheduled in committee Federal Relations, Energy and Telecommunications on 03/27/2019
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Federal Relations, Energy and Telecommunications
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Back for Redo
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 16, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 26, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Bruce Grubbs
Type:
Primary Sponsor