+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Taxation
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 03/28/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Taxation
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Edit
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Christopher Pope
Type:
Primary Sponsor