+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Judiciary
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 04/01/2021
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 3, 2020 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 17, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor