+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Education
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education on 01/20/2021
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Education on 01/14/2021
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Education
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 2, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On November 30, 2020 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 17, 2020 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On October 26, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor