+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (78)
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Free Conference Committee Report Received Free Conference
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Free Conference Committee Report Received Free Conference
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Free Conference on 04/18/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Free Conference Committee Appointed
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Free Conference Committee Appointed Free Conference
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Finance and Claims
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Finance and Claims
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 04/03/2019
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Finance and Claims
- First Reading
On March 30, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Appropriations
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Appropriations
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 03/21/2019
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Appropriations
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Back for Redo
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Final Review
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Matt Regier
Type:
Primary Sponsor