+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee Select Committee on Marijuana Law
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Select Committee on Marijuana Law
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Select Committee on Marijuana Law
- Hearing scheduled in committee Select Committee on Marijuana Law on 04/12/2021
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Select Committee on Marijuana Law
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Appropriations
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 04/06/2021
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Appropriations
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 03/31/2021
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Taxation
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Taxation
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Taxation
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor