+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
- Hearing scheduled in committee Energy, Technology and Federal Relations on 03/31/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 13, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor