+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee Finance and Claims
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 03/29/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Finance and Claims
- First Reading
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 23, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Appropriations
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Appropriations
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 03/20/2019
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Appropriations
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Frederick (Eric) Moore
Type:
Primary Sponsor