+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (77)
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
- Signed by Speaker
On May 1, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Finance and Claims
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Finance and Claims
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 04/23/2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee Finance and Claims
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Taxation
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Taxation
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 04/13/2021
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Taxation
- First Reading
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Appropriations
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 04/06/2021
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Appropriations
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Taxation
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 03/31/2021
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Taxation
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee Taxation
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Natural Resources
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Joshua Kassmier
Type:
Primary Sponsor