+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (44)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee State Administration
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee State Administration
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 04/12/2021
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- First Reading
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed State Administration
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed State Administration
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 03/24/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- First Reading
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
- Draft On Hold
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 6, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 21, 2020 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On August 24, 2020 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On August 10, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor