+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing Canceled
- Rereferred to Committee
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Printed - New Version Available
- Motion Carried
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Received
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 23, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 20, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
April 4, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 1
April 3, 2013: AMD-01 Wagoner D/PASS
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 16
April 3, 2013: Motion Carried
April 3, 2013: AMD-02 Wagoner D/PASS
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 1
April 3, 2013: Do Pass As Amended
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 36
March 27, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor