+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
On March 28, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
- Tabled in Committee
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Taken by Drafter
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 15, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor