+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (45)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Process
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Failed
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Back for Redo
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 3, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor