+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 23, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On October 9, 2012 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor