+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Motion Failed
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On March 12, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
- Draft Request Received
+ − Vote
March 28, 2011: Take from Comm-Hunter
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 57
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor