+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (51)
On April 19, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 23, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Education and Cultural Resources
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Education and Cultural Resources
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education and Cultural Resources on 03/13/2019
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Education and Cultural Resources
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 02/26/2019
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On October 15, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Daniel Zolnikov
Type:
Primary Sponsor