+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (60)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 22, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Edit
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor