+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (65)
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
- Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- First Reading
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 8, 2014 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (11)
April 23, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
April 20, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 10
April 18, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 18, 2015: AMD-1 Hansen D/PASS
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 2
April 16, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 6
April 13, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
March 31, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 30, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
March 27, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 8
March 25, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor