+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (51)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House with Amendments
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Taxation
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Taxation
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 03/11/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Taxation
- First Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Taxation
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Taxation
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 02/26/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Taxation
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 20, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 24, 2020 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 12, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor